U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCOY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.