U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PINEDA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.