U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NICELY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.