U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.