U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOBBS, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.