U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUMPKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.