U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CANNON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.