U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILL, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.