U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PALMORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.