U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WAMBLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.