U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VEAL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2022
  • April 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.