U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NIMMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Treatment]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.