U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOUSER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.