U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.