U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RENDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 10, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.