U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00099
  • Case Name: WILLIAMS v. KILBY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.