U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00248
  • Case Name: NEGRIN v. EVANS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order for Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.