U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00069
  • Case Name: COBURN v. ATHENS HEART CENTER PC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.