U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00115
  • Case Name: JIMMERSON v. STATE OF GEORGIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to File Prisoner Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.