U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00295
  • Case Name: SANDERS v. FORD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order for Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Directing Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.