U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00297
  • Case Name: REDDICK v. US ARMY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.