U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCLAM et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.