U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCGROTHA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.