U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: CRUTCHLEY v. ADDISON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to File Prisoner Account Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.