U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00316
  • Case Name: BURCH v. CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order for Pretrial Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.