U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00352
  • Case Name: HOWARD v. WEBB et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.