U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cv-00107
  • Case Name: ANDERSON v. LOWNDES COUNTY JAIL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.