U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00157
  • Case Name: GAY v. ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE COURTS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to File Prisoner Account Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.