U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00396
  • Case Name: GRANT v. WARD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order to Produce State Prisoner]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.