U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00186
  • Case Name: WATTS v. SELENE FINANCE LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order - Rules 16/26]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.