U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00360
  • Case Name: JOHNSON v. WARD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.