U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30216
  • Case Name: Ann Bridget Hudson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Fees Paid (Misc.)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Notice to Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Memo Regarding Debtor Email]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Add Judge]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.