U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50784-bem
  • Case Name: Crystal Marie Hudson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [0-Reaffirmation Agreement -- (No Undue Hardship)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [P-Schedule J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Extend Time, Motion to]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [06-Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.