U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-61378-jwc
  • Case Name: Alicia Shanta Taylor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Order Discharging 12/13 Trustee - Case Converted]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule J]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule I]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule C]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule A/B]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Statement of Intention]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Trustee's (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Order Terminating Employer Deduction Order (Conv/Dsm/Plan completed ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Request for Entry of Order Terminating Employer Deduction Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [07-First Request to Conv. From 13 to 7 Granted]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [First Request to Convert from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.