U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-53680-pmb
  • Case Name: CAC Projects, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Examination Pursuant to FRBP 2004 (440)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Abandonment (556)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [Examination, Motion for]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [Notice of Abandonment of Property]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [05-Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Steil, Kathleen [Examination pursuant to FRBP 2004, Motion for]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.