U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50699
  • Case Name: Terrence Tremaine Howard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Notice to Pro Se Debtor]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Court's Notice of Deficient Filings]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Installment Payment]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Installment Payment]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.