U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50712
  • Case Name: Misti Dawn Weinberger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Memo Regarding Debtor Email]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Court's Notice of Deficient Filings]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Notice to Pro Se Debtor]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.