open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii

HAWAII PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Hawaii
    Case Number:19-01027
    Party Name:Michael Dean Moss and Rachel Celeste Moss
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Contempt (Motion)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Reopen Ch 7 Case]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Reopen Ch 7 Case (Motion) (FEE 260)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 181)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.hib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92258
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =