U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Newman v. Payette, The City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Costs Taxed]
  • April 21, 2016: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • April 21, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 22, 2015: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 22, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 05, 2015: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Witness List]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 05, 2015: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 11, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 02, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2015: [Disclosure Statement]
  • June 16, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2015
  • April 29, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.