U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Carney v. Ford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Return Mail]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • January 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 28, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 23, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2015: [Errata]
  • December 11, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 30, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Strike]
  • July 16, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
May, 2015
  • May 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.