U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Idaho Rivers United et al v. Hudson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Costs Taxed]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 27, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 24, 2015: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 03, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order]
  • June 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 25, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 25, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 25, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2015: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 25, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 25, 2015: [Declaration]
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2015: [Intervene]
May, 2015
  • May 19, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.