U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Hyde v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
May, 2015
  • May 29, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.