U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Goodliffe v. Madison School District No. 321 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 09, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2016: [Report of Mediation]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2015: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • September 02, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
  • August 03, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 08, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.