U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Jacobson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • December 15, 2015: [Remand]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2015: [Declaration]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • September 08, 2015: [Administrative Record]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 01, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order]
  • June 09, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.