U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:95-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Fields v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • January 15, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2016: [Response (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 24, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 08, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 28, 2015: [Stipulation]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 25, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.