U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Dahl et al v. Watkins and Shepard Leasing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2016: [Exclude]
  • May 26, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 04, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order]
  • September 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • September 11, 2015: [Consolidate Cases]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 31, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 31, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 08, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • June 26, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.