U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00234
  • Case Name: Wurtz v. Huff
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 09, 2015: [Stay]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.