U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00248
  • Case Name: Ingle v. ABC Financial Services Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 08, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 31, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.