U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League v. Farnsworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
July, 2016
  • July 03, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Errata]
  • April 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Declaration]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • February 01, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [USCA Order]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 04, 2015: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Order]
  • July 10, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.