U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Tobin v. Healthsource Partners, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 09, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 22, 2016: [Seal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [ADR Plan]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Certificate of Compliance]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 11, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 11, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 15, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.